Plarr's Lives of the Fellows
First Title value, for Searching
by
Sarah Gillam
Publication Date
2012-01-05 2014-11-25
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E001000-E001999/E001800-E001899
Occupation
Details
Martin Hamilton Kemp was a consultant ophthalmic surgeon in Hereford and Worcester. He qualified MB BS in Durham in 1952. He gained his diploma in ophthalmology in 1962 and his FRCS in 1964. Prior to his consultant appointment, he was an ophthalmic registrar at the Royal Victoria Infirmary in Newcas
Resource Identifier
RCS: E001810
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Enid Taylor
Publication Date
2010-10-14
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E001000-E001999/E001000-E001099
Occupation
Details
Charles James Frederick Maguire was a consultant ophthalmic surgeon at Royal Victoria Hospital, Belfast. He was born in County Wicklow, Ireland, on 10 May 1931 to Charles Maguire, a nonconformist minister, and Gertrude née Armitage. He was at school in Belfast, attending the Methodist College, and c
Resource Identifier
RCS: E001041
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
View Other Search Results
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2014-11-26
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E006000-E006999/E006400-E006499
Occupation
Details
Rodney Brian De Saram received his medical education at University College Hospital and qualified MRCS LRCP in 1955. He obtained the MB BS in 1956; the DO Eng 1962, and the FRCS in 1966. He held resident posts at University College Hospital and Moorfields Eye Hospital, London. He was appointed consu
Resource Identifier
RCS: E006467
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Sarah Gillam
Publication Date
2014-11-25 2017-01-12
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E006000-E006999/E006400-E006499
Occupation
Details
Andrew Gentles was a consultant ophthalmic surgeon at Harrogate District General Hospital and Ripon and District General Hospital. He studied at Cambridge University and gained his diploma in ophthalmology in 1962 and his FRCS in 1968.
Prior to his consultant appointment he was a senior registrar
Resource Identifier
RCS: E006427
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
Limit Search Results
Narrowed by: