Plarr's Lives of the Fellows
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2013-03-21
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E003000-E003999/E003700-E003799
Occupation
Details
Joined the Ordnance Medical Department as 2nd Assistant Surgeon on November 13th, 1830. He rose to be 1st Assistant Surgeon on July 1st, 1831, and to be Surgeon on June 1st, 1846. He retired on half pay on May 15th, 1857, and appears to have lived abroad. He died in Dublin before June 18th, 1884.
Resource Identifier
RCS: E003738
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2013-07-25
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E004000-E004999/E004200-E004299
Occupation
Details
Born 21 May 1863, the third son and fourth of the ten children of the Rev Edward Peter Green and his wife Anne Griffiths. He was educated at Mercers' School and the London Hospital, and played in the Hospital rugby XV. He qualified LSA in 1884, and took the Conjoint diplomas the next year. On 30 Sep
Resource Identifier
RCS: E004284
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2013-03-21
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E003000-E003999/E003700-E003799
Occupation
Details
Educated at St Bartholomew's Hospital. Entering the Army as a Surgeon, he gained in 1853 Sir Gilbert Blane's Gold Medal. In 1854 he went out to the Crimea, and served with distinction, being awarded the Medals for the Crimea, Sebastopol, for Syria and the Baltic, also the Imperial Order of the Medji
Resource Identifier
RCS: E003745
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2013-11-21
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E004000-E004999/E004600-E004699
Occupation
Details
Morley was educated at Guy's Hospital. After qualifying in 1878-79 he acted as house surgeon and then as resident medical officer at the Northampton General Infirmary. After a period as surgeon to the East Lancashire Infirmary at Blackburn, he entered the Royal Naval Medical Service in 1883. Morley
Resource Identifier
RCS: E004691
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2013-09-30
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E004000-E004999/E004400-E004499
Occupation
Details
Born 14 October 1876, he was educated at Edinburgh University and the Medical School of the Edinburgh Royal Colleges, and at St Bartholomew's Hospital, London. He served as house physician at the Royal Infirmary and the Royal Hospital for Sick Children, Edinburgh, and as house surgeon at the General
Resource Identifier
RCS: E004427
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2013-09-30
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E004000-E004999/E004400-E004499
Occupation
Details
Born 17 August 1864 at Digby, Nova Scotia, the son of Alexander Macnab, civil engineer. He was educated at Winchester and received his medical training at King's College Hospital, where he served as house surgeon after taking the Conjoint qualification in 1887. At Netley, where he trained for the In
Resource Identifier
RCS: E004428
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2013-12-18
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E004000-E004999/E004800-E004899
Occupation
Details
Born on 13 May 1870 at Walton Priory, Liverpool, the ninth child and third son of William Wilson, shipping merchant, and Kate Howard Thompson, his wife. He was educated at Liverpool College, in the training-ship *Conway*, and at the Liverpool Medical School. Wilson was a fine athlete and a good foot
Resource Identifier
RCS: E004805
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2012-12-20
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E003000-E003999/E003200-E003299
Occupation
Details
Born on November 7th, 1818, and entered the Madras Army as Assistant Surgeon on January 25th, 1841. He was Surgeon to the 33rd Native Infantry, Madras, and saw active service in the Indian Mutiny (1857-1858). He died of dysentery at Dinapur on June 24th, 1858.
Resource Identifier
RCS: E003245
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
R P Craig
Publication Date
2011-11-09 2018-02-22
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E001000-E001999/E001500-E001599
Occupation
Details
Major General Andrew Clyne, a hugely experienced military surgeon who served in a number of campaigns, was director general of medical services for the Royal Australia Army Medical Corps. He was born on 30 June 1907 in Melbourne, Australia, the eldest son of Andrew Morrison Clyne, a stock and statio
Resource Identifier
RCS: E001527
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Sarah Gillam
Publication Date
2012-02-29 2014-03-14
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E002000-E002999/E002000-E002099
Occupation
Details
Juan Ignacio Vergara was a military surgeon and director of the Santiago Military Hospital, Chile. The Royal College of Surgeons was informed of this death in February 2012.
Resource Identifier
RCS: E002066
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2013-10-02
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E004000-E004999/E004400-E004499
Occupation
Details
Born in Meerut, India, on 25 April 1865, son of Surgeon Jesse Griggs Pilcher, IMS, afterwards Deputy Surgeon-General and FRCS. He was educated at Clifton College and at Clare College, Cambridge, where he graduated in 1887. He took his clinical training at Guy's Hospital and qualified in 1890. Pilche
Resource Identifier
RCS: E004467
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2013-01-17
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E003000-E003999/E003300-E003399
Occupation
Details
He served on board the *Anna Amelia* (1831-1832), and entered the Madras Army as Assistant Surgeon on May 19th, 1834, being promoted to Surgeon on January 31st, 1851; Surgeon Major on January 13th, 1860; Deputy Inspector-General on March 1st, 1863; and Inspector-General on August 1st, 1864. He saw a
Resource Identifier
RCS: E003389
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
Limit Search Results