Plarr's Lives of the Fellows
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2015-10-23
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E008000-E008999/E008500-E008599
Occupation
Details
Catherine Norah Dennis trained in Aberdeen and Madras. In the 1960's she worked for the Ministry of Health in Savile Row and moved to the Elephant and Castle when the Ministry became the Department of Health and Social Security. She retired to Truro in Cornwall and her solicitors informed the Colleg
Resource Identifier
RCS: E008581
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2015-04-13
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E007000-E007999/E007000-E007099
Occupation
Details
Robert Oliver Wheeler studied medicine at King's College, London and qualified MB BS in 1941. He passed the Conjoint Diploma in 1940 and the FRCS ten years later. He was surgical registrar to St Stephen's Hospital, London, and to Horton Hospital, Epsom, before becoming medical officer to Savernake H
Resource Identifier
RCS: E007035
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
View Other Search Results
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2014-02-10
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E005000-E005999/E005000-E005099
Occupation
Details
Born about 1870 he was educated at the University of Melbourne, qualified in 1892, and took the Fellowship in 1901. He practised at Bowral, New South Wales, where he was honorary medical officer to the Berrima District Hospital, and died there on 13 July 1953.
Resource Identifier
RCS: E005017
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Sarah Gillam
Publication Date
2015-06-12 2017-12-21
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E007000-E007999/E007400-E007499
Details
Heather Margaret Dukes was a general surgeon, paediatrician and general practitioner. She was born Heather Margaret Starkie in Hyde, Cheshire on 4 September 1942. Her father, Colin Starkie, was medical officer of health for Kidderminster; her mother was Margaret Joyce Starkie née Wrigley. She was ed
Resource Identifier
RCS: E007457
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2014-10-24
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E006000-E006999/E006200-E006299
Occupation
Details
John Joseph Walsh was educated at the National University of Ireland and graduated MB BCh BAO in 1921. He also studied at the London Hospital. In April 1922 he obtained the FRCS. Walsh was for a time the deputy medical superintendant and surgical officer of the Mayday Hospital, London, and took the
Resource Identifier
RCS: E006206
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2015-04-23
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E007000-E007999/E007100-E007199
Occupation
Details
Derek Bown trained for the Conjoint Diploma at Guy's Hospital and became a Fellow of the College in 1930.
He held posts at the Taunton and Somerset Hospital and the Royal South Hants and Southampton Hospital and was medical officer for Reckitt's Convalescent Home in Essex. He became honorary surg
Resource Identifier
RCS: E007122
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2015-12-07
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E008000-E008999/E008900-E008999
Occupation
Details
Kenneth Sweetman qualified in Melbourne where he did junior posts. Later he worked as a surgical specialist in the Government Hospital in Tripoli, Libya and the Queen Elizabeth Hospital, Aden. His last position was Chief Medical Officer to the Shell Petroleum Company in Brunei. He retired to Hindhea
Resource Identifier
RCS: E008961
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Sarah Gillam
Publication Date
2011-11-14 2014-06-03
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E001000-E001999/E001500-E001599
Occupation
Details
Daphne Mary Scott was a medical officer for Family Planning Association (FPA) clinics in Croydon, Westminster and Oxted. She was born in Ealing, London, on 2 April 1919, the elder daughter of Sir Harold Richard Scott, a civil servant, and Ethel Mary Scott née Golledge. Scott's father was in charge o
Resource Identifier
RCS: E001582
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2014-06-26
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E005000-E005999/E005600-E005699
Occupation
Details
Educated at Queen's College, Belfast, where he qualified in 1893, and at the London Hospital, he took the Fellowship within a month of taking the Conjoint diplomas in 1896. Settling in Natal, South Africa, he was appointed Physician to Grey's Hospital, Pietermaritzburg. He was also medical officer o
Resource Identifier
RCS: E005607
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2014-08-05
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E005000-E005999/E005700-E005799
Occupation
Details
Guinane graduated from the University of Sydney in 1927, and served as house surgeon (1927-28) and senior house surgeon (1928-29) at the Prince Alfred Hospital. He was resident medical officer at the Sydney Women's Hospital 1929-30 and at the Royal Alexandra Hospital for Children 1930-31. He then ca
Resource Identifier
RCS: E005762
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2015-03-19
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E006000-E006999/E006900-E006999
Occupation
Details
Norman Armitage Sprott studied medicine at Oxford University, St Thomas's, the London Hospital and the Middlesex Hospital. His varied posts included medical officer to the Hyderabad State Railways, member of the medical board of Eton College and medical superintendent of St Columba's Hospital, Londo
Resource Identifier
RCS: E006969
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2014-10-24
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E006000-E006999/E006200-E006299
Occupation
Details
John Ernest Price Watts of Buckhurst Hill, Essex, passed the Conjoint Examination in 1911, and in 1913 the Fellowship of the Royal College of Surgeons of England. He worked at the Westminster, King's College London, and St Bartholomew's Hospitals. He was medical officer and later consultant surgeon
Resource Identifier
RCS: E006200
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
Limit Search Results
Narrowed by: