Plarr's Lives of the Fellows
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2010-05-26
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E001000-E001999/E001000-E001099
Occupation
Details
Educated at the Borough Schools, and became a Surgeon in the Royal Navy, from which he retired as Staff Surgeon (2nd Class). He was then for a time Surgeon to Parkhurst Prison, Isle of Wight. He died at his residence, 12 Trentham Terrace, Grove Road, Bow Road, E, on March 27th, 1876.
Resource Identifier
RCS: E001003
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2012-02-15
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E002000-E002999/E002000-E002099
Occupation
Details
Was gazetted Hospital Assistant to the Forces on Dec 1st, 1825, Assistant Surgeon to the 1st Foot on November 16th, 1826, to the 12th Dragoons on Oct 8th, 1830, and to the Coldstream Guards on March 15th, 1838. He was promoted Surgeon to the same on April 14th, 1843, and Surgeon Major on September 2
Resource Identifier
RCS: E002034
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
View Other Search Results
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2012-04-04
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E002000-E002999/E002100-E002199
Occupation
Details
Practised in Church Street, Lancaster. He had among his apprentices Richard Owen (qv), transferred to him in 1823 by Joseph Seed, who had become a naval surgeon. Harrison's pupils had access to the County Gaol, and carried out post-mortem examinations, which served to interest Owen in anatomy, as is
Resource Identifier
RCS: E002143
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2012-08-01
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E002000-E002999/E002600-E002699
Occupation
Details
Studied at Edinburgh University, Guy's and St Thomas's Hospitals. He started practice at Reading in 1822, and soon after was appointed Surgeon on the Staff of the Reading Dispensary. On the foundation of the Royal Berkshire Hospital he was elected the Senior of the Surgeons, the other two being F A
Resource Identifier
RCS: E002695
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
First Title value, for Searching
by
Royal College of Surgeons of England
Publication Date
2013-02-13
Unknown
Asset Path
Root/Lives of the Fellows/E003000-E003999/E003500-E003599
Occupation
Details
Received his early professional education under William Travis, of Scarborough, remaining with him till he came of age. He afterwards attended the Medical Schools of Guy's and St Thomas's Hospitals, and spent a short period in those of Paris. He began to practise in York at the age of 25, and was so
Resource Identifier
RCS: E003560
Collection
Plarr's Lives of the Fellows Obituary
Asset
Limit Search Results
Narrowed by: